THE GRATTON SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receipt of Charitable donations on behalf of patients of the Gratton Surgery. Donations are for the good of all patients registered at the Gratton Surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JAMES ADAM POOLE READ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Victoria Browne | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Lorne McEwan | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET TAPLIN | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr BONNIE TOULSON | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SMITH | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30k | £28.01k | £3.40k | £38.50k | £1.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 23 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF GRATTON SURGERY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Area of benefit
GRATTON SURGERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gratton Surgery
Sutton Scotney
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO21 3LE
- Phone:
- 01962 760394
- Email:
- mh.gratton@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window