HELA SARANA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons suffering from financial hardship,sickness or distress or otherwise in need. Promote and advance education opprortunities of such persons Promote employment opportunities through micro finance schemes Promote rural agriculture through established and modern technologies Promote harmonious relations between communities Provide clean water for human consumption
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redbridge
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 21 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Senerath Jayanthi Perera | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
IRIE PERERA | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr jeevani Jayawardena | Trustee | 17 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
Gamage Aruna Nayananada Perera | Trustee | 22 March 2003 |
|
|
||||
METHSIRI WIJERATNA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SAMAN DEVAPRIYA BALASURIYA PERERA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Vidanage Sirimewan Palitha SERASINGHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WEWAGE LESLIE PATRICK DEP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAMALA MESTHRIGE RANJITH JAYANTHA SILVA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASOKA JINENDRADASA BOLLEGALA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.86k | £50.97k | £42.89k | £33.47k | £21.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.84k | £47.94k | £50.64k | £37.49k | £14.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 4 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT IN RURAL SRI LANKA, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Haydon Road
Dagenham
Essex
RM8 2PA
- Phone:
- 02085543387
- Email:
- secretary@helasarana.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window