BETHANIE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities centre on supporting Bill and Jan Gordon as mission workers living in France. This includes organising meetings to share the good news of Jesus Christ, bringing together Christians from Protestant and Catholic traditions, organising Christian teaching meetings, and visiting and teaching at churches and conferences in France and the Channel Islands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- France
Governance
- 16 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Durston | Chair |
|
||||||
HELEN JEAN SQUIRES | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jan Durston | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SQUIRES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £3.83k | £3.41k | £3.46k | £3.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £3.97k | £3.22k | £3.35k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN FRANCE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
FRANCE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Coniston Road
Chippenham
SN14 0PX
- Phone:
- 01249765868
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window