THE PRESTWOOD SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the further development of the Sprinters Sports Centre for the benefit of the Prestwood and Great Missenden communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 September 2001: Standard registration
- SPRINTERS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HILARY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM STOCKDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN MARK RIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £49.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £98 | £63.32k | £63.32k | £52.28k | £47 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3RD AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE PRESTWOOD AND GREAT MISSENDEN AREA OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
PRESTWOOD AND GREAT MISSENDEN AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Collings Walk
Prestwood
GREAT MISSENDEN
HP16 0RX
- Phone:
- 01494865900
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window