SOUTH TYNESIDE VISUALLY IMPAIRED COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING INFORMATION TO VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES. SEEKING IMPROVEMENTS TO SERVICES FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE BY WORKING WITH OTHER STATUTORY / VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHERE POSSIBLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 24 July 2001: Standard registration
- STVIC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MICHAEL LUNN | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON TURNER | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marian Elizabeth STEAD | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|||||
SHIELA CAWKWELL | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|||||
ROSE MARY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.04k | £0 | £394 | £471 | |
|
Total expenditure | £971 | £190 | £278 | £688 | £868 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN SOUTH TYNESIDE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS. 2) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE BY REDUCING SOCIAL ISOLATION AND PROMOTING SELF HELP AND MUTUAL SUPPORT. 3) TO RAISE AWARENESS OF BLINDNESS AND VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AMONGST PROFESSIONALS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
SOUTH TYNESIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 YORK AVENUE
JARROW
NE32 5LP
- Phone:
- 01914475581
- Email:
- marian.44@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window