Accounts and annual returns THE SIR GEORGE MARTIN MUSIC FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1086629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | 12 March 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 20 July 2009 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 01 April 2009 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 01 August 2008 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | 05 June 2008 | 66 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 30 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 30 March 2007 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window