Financial history THE SIR GEORGE MARTIN MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086629
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2004 31/05/2005 31/05/2006 31/05/2007 31/05/2008
Total gross income £43.48k £46.49k £106.03k £95.09k £47.59k
Total expenditure £60.11k £188.58k £268.03k £174.48k £72.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A