RUSHMORE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and organising activities beneficial for the children and the school community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 May 2001: Standard registration
- RUSHMORE PTA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Louise Montagu | Chair | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ayman Gammall | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Josephine Crookes | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mhairi MacLachlan Grimsditch | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wasilat Omotunde A Oyefolu-Alukwu | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.28k | £11.65k | £11.29k | £28.62k | £35.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £19.53k | £9.76k | £5.22k | £38.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING RUSHMORE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Area of benefit
HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rushmore School
Elderfield Road
Hackney
London
E5 0LE
- Phone:
- 02089853175
- Email:
- rushmorepta@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window