FRIEND IN NEED COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support for the elderly of Barnet in the form of [but not limited to] day care, good neighbour schemes, carer support, community transport, shopping, bill payments and pension collection, health and fitness. The community transport and shopping service operate across the whole borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 19 February 2002: Standard registration
- 12 September 2017: Funds received from 1122265 VINTAGE VOLUNTEERING
- FIN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RUPERT LAZAR | Chair |
|
||||||
Philip Cohen | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Marie Sauka | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharmini Chandrasekar | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Murray | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Nipps | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Small | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.69k | £135.74k | £121.94k | £352.61k | £89.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.95k | £196.26k | £147.55k | £112.93k | £108.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £92.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POOR, AGED, SICK AND DISABLED IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE SERVICES, GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEMES, COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SCHEMES AND SUPPORT FOR CARERS IN CO-OPERATION WITH LOCAL CHURCHES, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST BARNET BAPTIST CHURCH
CRESCENT ROAD
BARNET
EN4 8PS
- Phone:
- 02084495320
- Email:
- fin@fin-eastbarnet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window