Financial history THE KING'S OWN ROYAL BORDER REGIMENT ASSOCIATION BAND

Charity number: 1087904
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £923 £626 £1.56k £750 £262
Total expenditure £458 £482 £1.09k £410 £204
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A