INTERNATIONAL STRESS MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information about stress and stress management to the public and organisations. Running conferences and workshops. Information dissemination and networking. Promoting National Stress Awareness Week in November each year. Providing a referral service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 August 2001: Standard registration
- ISMA (UK) (Working name)
- ISMA INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Rose Spiers | Chair | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Noam Dvir | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Florence Edmonds McKeown | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Patrick McKeown | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Dorrington | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rose Turnbull | Trustee | 27 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Segall | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deep Dhir | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Clark | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.45k | £21.51k | £24.36k | £23.94k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.38k | £20.81k | £30.07k | £19.75k | £19.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2014
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF BIOLOGICAL STRESS. B) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Cromford Road
Crich
Matlock
DE4 5DJ
- Phone:
- 07823 745056
- Email:
- admin@isma.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window