Accounts and annual returns SCUNTHORPE LITTLE THEATRE CLUB

Charity number: 1088115
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required