Governing document COMMUNITY HEALTH WORKS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES (THE AREA OF BENEFIT).
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.