FAMILY MATTERS YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to equip adults and children in York with relationship skills to empower them to make better relationship decisions. We provide courses, training and materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 30 August 2001: Standard registration
- FMY (Working name)
- YORK COMMUNITY FAMILY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Margaret Dunlop FCIPD | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Linsay Cunningham | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Hale | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bloss | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL ROSS RGN BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.56k | £47.78k | £51.25k | £64.68k | £35.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.56k | £49.31k | £51.65k | £52.21k | £51.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 17 AUG 2001 AS AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MATTERS CONCERNING MARRIAGE, PARENTING, FAMILY LIFE AND RELATIONSHIPS WITH A VIEW TO STRENGTHENING AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE, AND THE DOING OF ALL SUCH THINGS, BEING CHARITABLE IN LAW, AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Chad's Church
36 Campleshon Road
York
YO23 1EY
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- info@fmy.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window