Accounts and annual returns BIRMINGHAM COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1088434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 September 2023 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 September 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required