Financial history EAST DURHAM PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1090261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £664.35k £753.69k £775.63k £755.06k £1.04m
Total expenditure £697.51k £795.73k £834.94k £793.23k £890.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £145.62k
Income from government grants £37.67k £27.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.00k £42.50k £20.00k £49.75k £360.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £550.28k £692.15k £755.60k £696.72k £678.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £511 £59 £36 £730 £2.26k
Income - Other £90.56k £18.98k £0 £7.86k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £42.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £697.51k £795.73k £834.94k £793.23k £886.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.01k £15.36k £0 £13.97k £21.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.71k