REUSE NETWORK LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Reuse Network is the umbrella group for organisations involved in the relief of poverty through the re-use of household items. We work to increase goods available, raise the number of beneficiaries and support organisations to manage and develop. We lobby to ensure that legislation and funding benefits the sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 February 2002: Standard registration
- F.R.N (Working name)
- FURNITURE RECYCLING NETWORK (Previous name)
- FURNITURE REUSE NETWORK (Previous name)
- FURNITURE RE-USE NETWORK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Connor Macdonald | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Westgarth | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harrison | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Donovan | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Mackenzie Macleod | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cawley | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wheatley | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Ward | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £437.70k | £401.09k | £513.17k | £356.57k | £366.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £428.03k | £362.86k | £478.71k | £435.06k | £415.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £160.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £66.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £286.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £7 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £160.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £398.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £80.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES ADVICE AND INFORMATION THAT WILL DEVELOP, ESTABLISH AND ASSIST FURNITURE RECYCLING CHARITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48-54 WEST STREET
ST PHILIPS
BRISTOL
BS20BL
- Phone:
- 07968729208
- Email:
- info@reuse-network.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window