Financial history EIKOKU IESU NO MITAMA KYOKAI

Charity Number: 1088146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £206.26k £181.34k £139.77k £142.45k £173.88k
Total expenditure £223.08k £192.79k £169.08k £171.21k £168.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A