ANJALI DANCE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anjali Dance Company is a pioneering professional company that exists to realise and celebrate through dance the potential of people with learning disabilities by creating original works of excellence performed by dancers with learning disabilities and by providing education programmes that employ and develop the skills of people with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 June 2001: Standard registration
- 03 April 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.79k | £119.32k | £113.32k | £142.33k | £116.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.32k | £138.07k | £135.35k | £141.84k | £137.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 March 2012 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 26 March 2012 | 55 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH DANCE ACTIVITIES WITH AND FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window