HORSHAM VOLUNTEER BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote volunteering and good practice in support of volunteer opportunities 2. To provide information and advice on volunteering opportunities 3. To liaise and work in partnership with local voluntary and statutory agencies 4. To develop, where possible, volunteer action in response to local needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 June 2001: Standard registration
- 14 January 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 January 2009: Funds transferred to 1117718 HORSHAM VOLUNTARY ACTION
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE HORSHAM DISTRICT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.11k | £60.84k | £62.50k | £45.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.03k | £57.19k | £52.05k | £47.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 02 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 02 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 30 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 26 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 26 April 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 November 2005 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 11 November 2005 | 11 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JANUARY 1996, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11TH JUNE 2001, AND 15TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF HORSHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window