CITIZENS ADVICE THANET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To deliver the Citizens Advice service to the people of Thanet, ensuring as far as possible that individuals do not suffer through lack of knowledge of their rights and responsibilities or of the services available to them or through an inability to express their needs effectively. Also to exercise a responsible influence on the development of social policies both locally and nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £127,202 from 3 government contract(s) and £133,829 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 30 May 2001: Standard registration
- 27 March 2020: Funds received from 1140926 KENT AND MEDWAY CITIZENS ADVICE
- THANET DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Dina Parmar | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Hawkes | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connor Harney | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Kim Wilding | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Emma Jacqueline Mitchell | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellis | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES FARRER | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335.42k | £405.62k | £302.99k | £156.45k | £359.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.10k | £344.68k | £253.06k | £161.60k | £291.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £104.00k | £122.65k | £127.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £316.01k | £94.00k | £104.00k | £24.94k | £133.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/10/2015 as amended on 13 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE ISLE OF THANET IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE ISLE OF THANET IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITIZENS ADVICE THANET
MILL LANE HOUSE
MILL LANE
MARGATE
CT9 1LB
- Phone:
- 01843228643
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window