THE LEARNING CURVE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Learning Curve provides training, education and support to vulnerable and disadvantaged individuals to help them improve their lives. In addition, we support other third sector organisations who also contribute to these aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,243 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Hampshire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 February 2002: Standard registration
- THE LEARNING CURVE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Rendle | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sean Westlake | Trustee | 22 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £563.85k | £105.57k | £67.36k | £204.98k | £235.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £633.17k | £73.27k | £57.18k | £153.45k | £157.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £412.24k | £45.57k | £67.36k | £43.25k | £72.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | £119.26k | £43.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £532.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £77 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £633.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Learning Curve
Swarthmore
78 Mutley Plain
Plymouth
PL4 6LF
- Phone:
- 01803551551
- Email:
- info@eatthatfrog.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window