Trustees MOLD TOWN CONCERT BAND YR WYDDGRUG
Charity number: 1088079

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN WELLS | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Owen Roberts | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Jewell | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Drakeford | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth May Drakeford | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Milnes | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SENNETT | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY COWARD | Trustee | 26 March 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.