Financial history MASJID ALI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1093940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £261.75k £189.25k £252.84k £249.70k £313.88k
Total expenditure £201.23k £225.15k £210.84k £228.23k £236.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A