Financial history HEUGH GUN BATTERY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1106882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £74.07k £134.95k £130.04k £168.00k £441.69k
Total expenditure £61.94k £85.70k £150.59k £172.00k £170.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.56k £23.32k £2.75k £50.00k £4.50k