Accounts and annual returns SAINT JOHN'S CHURCH DONISTHORPE BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1096636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 05 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 28 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 17 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required