ARKWRIGHT SCHOLARSHIPS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arkwright Scholarships Trust promotes the rewards of an engineering/technology career to young people through sponsored scholarships. These are funded by industrial companies, various organisations, charitable trusts and interested individuals. Awards are made to high calibre students who plan to study the relevant 'A' level subjects which lead to an engineering degree course and to their schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 May 2002: Standard registration
- 17 December 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 17 December 2020: Funds transferred to 313719 SMALLPEICE TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 04/01/2018 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £970.59k | £881.51k | £891.31k | £1.36m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £903.18k | £1.01m | £1.05m | £1.61m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £894.49k | £803.73k | £821.21k | £1.28m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.02k | £14.59k | £10.97k | £7.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £61.08k | £63.19k | £59.14k | £70.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £817.43k | £900.10k | £925.21k | £1.41m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £127.02k | £199.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.28k | £5.05k | £4.99k | £11.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 30 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2018 | 15 November 2018 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2018 | 15 November 2018 | 11 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME AWARDED TO PERSONS ENTERING A COURSE LEADING TO THE GENERAL CERTIFICATE OF EDUCATION ADVANCED LEVEL EXAMINATIONS (OR ANY EXAMINATIONS DEEMED BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE EQUIVALENT THERETO OR TO HAVE BEEN SUBSTITUTED THEREFOR) IN TECHNOLOGICAL, ENGINEERING AND DESIGN- RELATED SUBJECTS AND WHO HAVE (IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES) EDUCATIONAL OR FINANCIAL NEED FOR SUCH ASSISTANCE; (B) BY MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITABLE SCHOOLS COLLEGES UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS NOW EXISTING OR HEREINAFTER TO EXIST WHICH PROMOTE EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IF MORE THAN ONE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND SO THAT ANY DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS MAY BE MADE EITHER FOR THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE SCHOOLS COLLEGES UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHERE APPROPRIATE OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHERE APPROPRIATE OR FOR ANY SPECIAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE INVOLVING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) GENERALLY BY SUCH THINGS AS MAY ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window