Financial history DEWODE, UGANDA (DEDICATED WOMEN IN DEVELOPMENT)

Charity number: 1091946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £10.78k £10.39k £10.83k £17.72k £13.89k
Total expenditure £11.28k £10.61k £12.99k £10.01k £17.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A