EXETER COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EXVAC is a childrens charity which works to take children from socially and financially underpriveleged backgrounds (eg: abused children, young carers, low-income families) away on holiday for a week. We run two week-long holidays, each for 16 children under the supervision of 8 leaders, incorporating a wide range of trips and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- EXVAC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.83k | £11.84k | £15.37k | £20.54k | £39.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.73k | £1.44k | £23.63k | £18.36k | £30.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 2001, 13 MAY 2003 AND 14 OCTOBER 2008. AS AMENDED ON 18 JAN 2011 as amended on 21 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN FROM THE OXFORD AREA WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROVIDE FREE HOLIDAYS FOR DEPRIVED CHILDREN FROM THE OXFORD AREA. THE CHILDREN ARE TO BE RECOMMENDED BY SOCIAL SERVICES AND/OR OTHER QUALIFIED ORGANISATIONS. THE CHILDREN SHOULD BE: I) IN REAL NEED DUE TO A STRESSFUL HOME SITUATION II) IN FAMILIES SO FINANCIALLY DEPRIVED THAT THE CHILDREN WOULD NOT OTHERWISE GET A HOLIDAY.
Area of benefit
THE OXFORD AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window