Financial history FATHER'S HOUSE SABBATH CONGREGATION

Charity number: 1087150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £130.53k £132.73k £138.92k £93.50k £108.15k
Total expenditure £94.03k £86.37k £82.97k £86.38k £92.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A