FATHER'S HOUSE SABBATH CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 June 2001: Standard registration
- MCF (Working name)
- MOLD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL FRYER | Chair | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ESTHER BALL | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DARNELL | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CORTEEN | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.53k | £132.73k | £138.92k | £93.50k | £108.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.03k | £86.37k | £82.97k | £86.38k | £92.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELEIFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN FLINTSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
FLINTSHIRE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FATHERS HOUSE
5-6 ROWLEYS PARK
EVANS WAY
SHOTTON DEESIDE
Select S
- Phone:
- 01244823378
- Email:
- shirleyfryer@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window