Financial history GINGERBREAD COTTAGE PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1087112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £996.84k £898.54k £815.50k £859.39k £808.80k
Total expenditure £983.77k £745.41k £777.92k £801.90k £838.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.39k £0 £355 £5.56k £3.21k
Income - Charitable activities £995.06k £884.40k £815.15k £848.39k £796.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £392 £148 £44 £1.94k £7.77k
Income - Other £0 £14.00k £10.16k £3.50k £1.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £983.46k £745.41k £777.92k £801.23k £833.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £312 £0 £0 £674 £5.40k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £600 £600 £600 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0