ALBARACA NURSERY SCHOOL, THE GAMBIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports Albaraca Nursery School in the town of Sukuta, The Gambia, which opened in 1998. There are now 160 children, 8 teachers (7 of whom are fully trained and qualified) with 5 rooms, a kitchen and small medical area. We also support the local community by providing mosquito nets for families with children at the school. 5 local Gambians help the trustees to manage the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- The Gambia
Governance
- 15 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Adnitt | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Isabelle Eleanor Wong | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Chattaway | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Kelly | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa deLaurentis | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL LOUISE WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH ADNITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.91k | £23.86k | £18.76k | £20.96k | £17.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.18k | £23.88k | £18.35k | £16.99k | £21.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22 JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF A NURSERY SCHOOL, MEDICAL FACILITIES, GOODS AND CLOTHING.
Area of benefit
SUKUTA, THE GAMBIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Station Road
Balsall Common
Coventry
CV7 7FN
- Phone:
- 01676532624
- Email:
- john.adnitt@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window