THE HAYDOCK BAND

Charity number: 1088490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of brass instruments, tution and band services in both a social and competitive environment - training of individuals and groups in music both tradditional and new brass band genres

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,890
Total expenditure: £25,575

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GODFREY IRVING Chair
None on record
Hannah Roughley Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
NICOLA TRACEY MORAN Trustee
None on record
LISA MARIE FORBES Trustee
None on record
MARK QUINN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.56k £9.81k £14.00k £15.11k £29.89k
Total expenditure £12.31k £9.82k £9.73k £13.10k £25.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 WOODALE CLOSE
GREAT SANKEY
WARRINGTON
WA5 3GL
Phone:
01925712069
Email:
No information available