CAMBERLEY & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camberley U3A is a self-help, self-managed lifelong learning co-operative for older people no longer in full-time work, providing opportunities for other members to share learning experiences in a wide range of interest groups and to pursue learning not for qualifications, but for fun.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Stewart | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CRABTREE BROWN | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stewart | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Cox | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rowland Bennett | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Catherine Callow | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Zymela | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sage | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.15k | £8.62k | £94.80k | £97.31k | £146.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.78k | £11.88k | £90.90k | £101.05k | £138.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21ST SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT IN CAMBERLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
CAMBERLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Southwell Park Road
CAMBERLEY
Surrey
GU15 3QQ
- Phone:
- 07572693323
- Email:
- BUSINESS@CU3A.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window