WITS FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities and in particular the advancement of education for the benefit of the public and in particular the advancement of education at the University of the Witwatersrand in South Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2001: Standard registration
- 18 October 2022: Funds received from 210710 UNIVERSITY OF THE WITWATERSRAND APPEAL FUND
- WITS UNIVERSITY (SOUTH AFRICA) CHARITABLE COMPANY, UK (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HENRY FRANKEL OBE FRSSA | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Professor Zeblon Zenzele Vilakazi | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Adam Mahomed Habib | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PROFESSOR COLIN JAMES BUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
SIR DAVID ANTHONY KING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £696.31k | £1.28m | £123.55k | £301.55k | £148.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £700.42k | £1.06m | £96.25k | £264.24k | £158.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £696.31k | £1.27m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £5.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £65 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £600.00k | £930.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £700.42k | £1.06m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £1.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.36k | £1.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £699.06k | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £1.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 MAY, 2001.
Charitable objects
SUCH GENERAL OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING WORDS) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE UNIVERSITY OF WITWATERSRAND IN SOUTH AFRICA.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25A FROGNAL
LONDON
NW3 6AR
- Phone:
- 02074355657
- Email:
- billfrankel@kayacomm.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window