SEEDS OF THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The general charitable Purpose of Seeds of the Future is to give aid to children and young people in Africa and to support development of their communities for improved quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
Governance
- 26 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD CLIFFORD YEBOAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 10 OCTOBER, 2001.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF CHILDREN IN RURAL AREAS OF AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN MATTERS RELATING TO HEALTH, EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING AND HOUSING.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 GRAVENEY GROVE
LONDON
SE20 8XG
- Phone:
- 07950853619
- Email:
- edyeboah5@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window