EQUALITY ACTION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charnwood Racial Equality Council was established in May 1969. In September 2008, CREC changed it name to Human Rights & Equalities Charnwood and in February 2017 became Equality Action Limited. Our aims are: Work towards eliminating discrimination Campaign for equality of opportunity Promote good relations between all persons in the Borough of Charnwood, in the County of Leicestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 September 2001: Standard registration
- CHARNWOOD RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL (Previous name)
- HUMAN RIGHTS & EQUALITIES CHARNWOOD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Geetha Balasubramaniam | Chair | 18 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Yasmin Ali-Hind | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dilshad Choudhury | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rachel Susan Thorpe | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Ben Smith | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abida Akram | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Charles Dobbin | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Jill Vincent | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.88k | £241.96k | £281.12k | £299.29k | £242.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.10k | £185.70k | £244.49k | £246.34k | £264.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.98k | £20.98k | £33.23k | £25.65k | £23.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 AUG 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUN 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR RACE, AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RELIGION AND BELIEF (B) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN ALL PERSONS, ESPECIALLY IN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Equality Action
66 Nottingham Road
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 1EU
- Phone:
- 01509261651
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window