SPANISH AND PORTUGUESE JEWS' SYNAGOGUE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To invest as a common fund for the benefit of the charities associated with the Spanish & Portuguese Jews' Congregation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 2004: Standard registration
- THE LONDON SEPHARDI TRUST INVESTMENT POOL (Working name)
- LST INVESTMENT POOL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID DWEK | Chair | 03 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Samuel Joseph Arwas | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Leon | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Philip Magnus | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Frank Martin | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY SMOUHA | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
GERARD MIZRAHI | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marc Iarchy | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD AZOUZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERNARD MOCATTA | Trustee |
|
||||||
LEON NAHON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.31k | £294.20k | £310.13k | £322.56k | £341.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.01k | £90.08k | £87.60k | £98.97k | £88.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF THE 29TH MAY 1958 AS VARIED OR AFFECTED BY FURTHER SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF THE 11TH JANUARY 1967 AND THE 7TH AUGUST 1969
Charitable objects
A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND ESTABLISHED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 29 MAY 1958 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES NAMED IN THAT SCHEME
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spanish & Portuguese Synagogue
2 Ashworth Road
Maida Vale
London
W9 1JY
- Phone:
- 02072892573
- Email:
- accounts@sephardi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window