THE BRITISH THOROUGHBRED RETRAINING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Thoroughbred Retraining Centre works for the welfare of all Thoroughbreds and retired racehorses. BTRC assesses and then rehabilitates, retrains and re-homes these horses to permanent loan homes throughout the UK where they are regularly monitored. BTRC never buys or sells horses - the horses are donated to the charity and remain in the BTRC's ownership for the rest of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2001: Standard registration
- TRC (Working name)
- THE THOROUGHBRED REHABILITATION CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN SEXTON | Chair | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Sidlow | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harbord | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Thomas | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Scott | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE METZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.85k | £530.28k | £367.20k | £447.46k | £351.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £493.55k | £482.90k | £519.12k | £463.05k | £401.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £493.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £36.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £124 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £38.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £479.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 16TH MARCH 2002 as amended on 18 Nov 2016 as amended on 06 Feb 2019 as amended on 29 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE CARE, REHABILITATION, RETRAINING AND REHOMING OF THOROUGHBRED RACE HORSES AND THE PROTECTION OF THOROUGHBRED RACE HORSES FROM SUFFERING AND CRUELTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whinney Hill
Halton
Lancaster
LA2 6PQ
- Phone:
- 01524 812649
- Email:
- enquiries@thetrc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window