Governing document CUCKOOS NEST
Charity number: 1090934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2002 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CUCKOO'S NEST IS TO BENEFIT OR FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, PRIMARILY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF MARSDEN, IN SUCH A MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, BY RAISING FUNDS THROUGH THE SALE OF DONATED GOODS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.