THE SEXTON'S HOUSE BUSCOT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains the fabric of the Church of St Mary the Virgin Buscot and its churchyard and financially supports the Incumbent as required
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN WOOF | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Maureen Turner | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Farnol Jonathan Farnol | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.35k | £9.44k | £9.48k | £9.64k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.13k | £3.35k | £12.94k | £11.12k | £13.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
1) USE OF PROPERTY. SUBJECT AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED, THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL CONTINUE TO APPROPRIATE AND USE THE SAID LAND AND BUILDING FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING A RESIDENCE FOR A VERGER OF SEXTON OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, BUSCOTT (IN THE EVENT OF THE PROPERTY BEING SOLD SEE POINT 2) 2. APPLICATION OF INCOME. (1) THEREAFTER THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN MEETING THE SALARY AND EXPENSES OF THE VERGER OF SEXTON OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH OR SUCH PERSON OR PERSONS FOR THE TIME BEING CARRYING OUT DUTIES OF A VERGER OR SEXTON OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH.(2) SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE SAID INCOME FOR THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD THEREOF.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, BUSCOTT
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTON FARM
BUSCOT WICK
FARINGDON
SN7 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01367 252222
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window