THE MUSEUM BRIDPORT DORSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public in Bridport, Dorset and the surrounding area through the provision of a museum and historical reference centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,062 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 January 2002: Standard registration
- 24 April 2015: Funds received from 1069881 THE MUSEUM OF NET MANUFACTURE
- BRIDPORT MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Laetitia Pell | Chair | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jo Cooper | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Felicia LLoyd | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Davison | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Huxley | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Hamson | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RICHARD ISAACS | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Hunt | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Hampshire | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|||||
AMANDA CAMPBELL STREATFEILD | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.99k | £213.14k | £144.98k | £91.98k | £112.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.68k | £135.07k | £141.18k | £108.62k | £128.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £58.56k | £60.06k | £60.06k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £58.56k | £55.11k | N/A | N/A | £60.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7 JANUARY 2002. as amended on 09 Dec 2021 as amended on 14 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BRIDPORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
THE PUBLIC IN BRIDPORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridport Museum Trust
The Coach House
Gundry Lane
Bridport
DT6 3RJ
- Phone:
- 01308458703
- Email:
- office@bridportmuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window