Accounts and annual returns LIBRARIES NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1091228
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 March 2010 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 15 March 2010 43 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 February 2009 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 16 February 2009 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 October 2006 On Time