Financial history VOLUNTARY & COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 1087518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £439.64k £903.76k £979.44k £877.28k £1.13m
Total expenditure £440.31k £834.80k £936.43k £822.07k £1.11m
Income from government contracts £170.04k £867.16k £831.80k £93.36k £160.50k
Income from government grants £85.03k £14.96k N/A £685.33k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £14.96k £0 £0 £246
Income - Other trading activities N/A £4.04k £116.44k £68.66k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £868.20k £831.80k £786.44k £1.11m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £16.56k £24.85k £18.10k £19.75k
Income - Other N/A £0 £6.36k £4.08k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £829.49k £924.89k £819.81k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £5.31k £11.54k £2.26k £1.74k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £25.25k £36.44k £35.73k £8.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0