Governing document VOLUNTARY & COMMUNITY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 MAR 2021 as amended on 24 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
(a) to promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community particularly in the Borough of Calderdale and neighbouring districts across West Yorkshire (hereinafter called ‘the area of benefit’) in such charitable ways as the Trustees think fit and, in particular, the advancement of voluntary and community groups to improve the quality of life of the community in the area of benefit; (b) to promote any other charitable purposes within the United Kingdom which are, in the opinion of the Trustees, beneficial to the community, with a preference for those in the area of benefit; (c) to promote and organise co-operation in the achievement of the above purposes and to that end to bring together in council representatives of the voluntary and community organisations and statutory authorities within the area of benefit.
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.