Trustees VOLUNTARY & COMMUNITY
Charity Number: 1087518

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Ann Saunders | Chair | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Guy | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Butterworth | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Dolby | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Woodhead | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Sanderson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Frances Smith | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Charlotte Clay | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha McCormick | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Whiteley MBE | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.