Accounts and annual returns VOLUNTEER CENTRE LEWISHAM

Charity number: 1089900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On Time