Financial history VOLUNTEER CENTRE LEWISHAM

Charity Number: 1089900
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £318.14k £429.21k £324.01k £215.56k £146.98k
Total expenditure £273.10k £335.82k £379.32k £247.87k £235.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £148.09k £209.27k £0