Trustees ASSUNNAH ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1097565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Yousef Hussain Trustee 16 March 2025
ASSUNNAH ISLAMIC CENTRE
Received: 6 days late
Dr Omar Ugas Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Mohamed Abdulle Trustee 26 December 2017
ASSUNNAH ISLAMIC CENTRE
Received: 6 days late
KHALIFA WARSAME Trustee 27 December 2016
None on record
HABIB HUSSEIN MOHAMED Trustee 03 January 2012
None on record